FRIENDS OF ST. CUTHBERT'S SCHOOL, PATELEY BRIDGE

Charity number: 1110600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity raises funds to provide for school trips, equipment and activities for the pupils of St Cuthbert's CE Primary school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £1,816
Total expenditure: £2,102

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST. CUTHBERT'S SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Marshall Chair 01 September 2022
None on record
Katie Simpson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Ashby Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.04k £2.91k £750 £1.03k £1.82k
Total expenditure £1.98k £5.70k £494 £609 £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 October 2021 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Cuthberts C of E Primary School
King Street
Pateley Bridge
HARROGATE
HG3 5LE
Phone:
07840695426
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available