DISASTER RESPONSE LOGISTICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since Cyclone Nargis, DISASTER RESPONSE LOGISTICS (DRL) has been advising the Government of Myanmar in the removal of ship wrecks, sunken pontoons etc. from navigation channels. 2010 Haiti Earthquake DRL was engaged in co-ordinating the airlift of vital food items from the USA to Haiti. And it is planned to deploy a vessel to Haiti during the reconstruction phase estimated 5-7 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belize
- Burma
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Cuba
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- Grenada
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Indonesia
- Madagascar
- Maldives
- Marshall Islands
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Mozambique
- Nicaragua
- Saint Vincent
- Seychelles
- Solomon Islands
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Suriname
- Thailand
Governance
- 20 May 2005: Standard registration
- DRL (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BERESFORD-JAMIESON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL C WHITING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVI ROSE BERESFORD-JAMIESON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 July 2024 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE DISASTER PREPAREDNESS, DISASTER RESPONSE AND DISASTER SURVIVAL TECHNIQUES THROUGH EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN AREAS OR ADJACENT TO AREAS ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY NATURAL OR MAN MADE DISASTERS; WARS OR ARMED CONFLICT, WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION AND IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, RELIGION, CREED OR POLITICAL AFFILIATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY 1. TRANSPORTATION BY LAND SEA AND AIR OF HUMANITARIAN AID MATERIALS ON BEHALF OF NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS (NGOS) AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND COMMUNITIES PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE DURING DISASTER RELIEF AND RECONSTRUCTION OPERATIONS. 2. ACCOMMODATE, TRANSPORT, SUPPLY AND SUPPORT MEDICAL TEAMS IN DISASTER, EMERGENCY AND OTHER RESCUE AND RELIEF MISSIONS. 3. TRANSPORTATION AND OPERATION OF (MAN) PORTABLE WATER WELL DRILLING AND PUMPING EQUIPMENT TO REMOTE COASTAL AND ISLAND AREAS WITH EMPHASIS ON TRAINING AND SUPPORTING LOCAL TEAMS TO REPRODUCE DRILLING OPERATIONS IN ADJACENT COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 24
Lydon House
Dobson Road, Langley Green
Crawley
West Sussex
RH11 7UQ
- Phone:
- 01293571298
- Email:
- trustee2-1@drlogistics.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window