POTTERS CROSS MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Faith both within the UK and overseas. The relief of poverty, hardship and distrss both within the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 August 2005: Standard registration
- 01 April 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1151108 Mariposa International (SG)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £785 | £980 | £1.52k | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £1.44k | £1.77k | £1.36k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 25 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 19 August 2017 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 07 June 2016 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 3RD APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8TH JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window