Financial history MOUNTAIN OF MERCY

Charity Number: 1110463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £249.10k £263.46k £335.28k £346.99k £418.24k
Total expenditure £176.43k £244.90k £414.60k £310.80k £374.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A