Financial history SUNNYBANK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1109522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022 30/07/2023 30/07/2024
Total gross income £83.48k £86.22k £88.55k £78.25k £79.31k
Total expenditure £78.65k £79.35k £84.22k £77.64k £81.16k
Income from government contracts N/A £65.37k £75.19k £60.03k £67.88k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A