Accounts and annual returns CARDIFF STEINER EDUCATION INITIATIVE/ MENTER ADDYSG STEINER CAERDYDD

Charity number: 1111372
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 10 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 04 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 04 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 04 April 2007 On Time