World Church of Messiah UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to promote and advance religion and education in accordance with the doctrines of Meishu-Sama and in particular but not exclusively to benefit the public by teaching and practice of Johrei, natural farming, artistic activities and activities to aid the preservation and regeneration of the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Islington
Governance
- 06 June 2006: Standard registration
- THE JOHREI ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- IZUNOME KYODAN - UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDUARDO ALBERTO DE SOUZA NETO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eliza Junko Honda Mole | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keizo Miura | Trustee | 02 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOAQUIM DONHA ARTERO | Trustee | 21 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.49k | £84.26k | £49.32k | £52.28k | £39.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.97k | £37.80k | £52.48k | £17.56k | £19.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 December 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 December 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 December 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 December 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 December 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 December 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 JANUARY 2005 as amended on 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF MEISHU-SAMA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC BY THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF JOHREI, NATURAL FARMING, ARTISTIC ACTIVITIES TO AID THE PRESERVATION AND REGENERATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Diamond Accounts Limited
Suite F16
St. Georges Business Park
SITTINGBOURNE
Kent
ME10 3TB
- Phone:
- 02039500316
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window