THE (DAYALBAGH) RADHASOAMI SATSANG ASSOCIATION OF EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We do Satsang (Prayer) and cultural activities for children.Quiz pro gramme. Celebrations of special religious events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
195 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Throughout London
- Denmark
- Germany
- Scotland
- Sweden
Governance
- 17 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SHRI KUMAR GAUTAM | Chair | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANAND SRIVASTAV | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SATYADHAR MITTA | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUMATI SINGH | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAHESH OHRY | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
SURESH KUMAR KAPOOR | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.73k | £28.15k | £223.09k | £288.76k | £85.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.03k | £25.38k | £36.16k | £39.22k | £882.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AND AMENDED ON 5 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 29 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 29 JUNE 2014
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE RADHASOAMI FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BY - (A) PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PROPAGATION OF RADHASOAMI FAITH AND TO DISSEMINATE ITS TEACHINGS. (B) MAKING ARRANGEMENT FOR THE HOLDING OF SATSANG AND CELEBRATIONS OF BHANDARAS THROUGHOUT THE AREA OF OPERATION OF THE ASSOCIATION. (C) DOING ALL SUCH THINGS AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE FOR THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS IDEALS AND SERVICE TO MANKIND AMONG THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. (D) HELPING SABHA IN KEEPING GENERAL CONTROL ON THE CONDUCT OF SATSANGIS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SATSANG'S IDEALS. (E) CULTIVATING A SPIRIT OF COOPERATION AND ORGANISED ACTION IN AND AMONG BRANCH SATSANGS IN GENERAL AND SATSANGIS IN PARTICULAR AND OTHER SATSANG INSTITUTIONS OF THE REGION (II) TO RELIEVE NEEDS ARISING AS A RESULT OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, OLD AGE OR YOUTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS WITHIN EUROPE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stokenchurch Methodist Church
The Common
Stokenchurch
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
- Phone:
- 07843502981
- Email:
- reg.sec.drsae@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
drsae.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window