ALL AFGHAN ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Education -Teachers Training Seminar -Women's Support Group -Social Affairs -Translation and interpreting services -celebrating cultural evets -Magazine in Dari and Pashto -Nayestan Television
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 June 2005: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.75k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.44k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 22 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
A. TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS. B. TO PROMOTE ADULT EDUCATION AND TRAINING. C. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ABOUT HEALTH, WELFARE, HOUSING AND OTHER SOCIAL BENEFITS. D. TO PROVIDE OT ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES. E. TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN AFGHANISTAN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CLOTHES AND OTHER GOODS. F. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CULTURE OF AFGHANISTAN. G. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS CONCILIATION, MEDIATION, ARBITRATION OR REPARATION IN DISPUTES AND CONFLICTS OF PEOPLE FROM AFGHANISTAN SO AS TO RESOLVE SUCH CONFLICTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window