Financial history OUR LADY OF THE ROSARY SCHOOL (BLACKFEN) PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.45k £2.44k £12.57k £14.66k £16.59k
Total expenditure £5.47k £4.91k £9.48k £20.35k £6.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A