Trustees MARINELIFE
Charity number: 1110884

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Archibald Robertson | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Madge | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Agosti | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Olivia Anne McLaughlin | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lofts | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Clare Stenhouse | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD IAN MORRIS | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN FYFE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.