Friends of Gwent Music

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities are centred upon fundraising to support Gwent Music Support Service, Gwent Music groups and advance the musical education of students participating in these groups. This includes providing staffing for courses, musical equipment/scores and supporting student travel/accommodation especially at specific events & tours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 20 May 2005: Standard registration
- FOGGYWS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF GREATER GWENT YOUTH MUSIC (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE GREATER GWENT YOUTH WIND SYMPHONIA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Sharon Robinson | Chair | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katie Mogford | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wakefield | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Jane Siddall | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Baynton | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd William Pearce | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Martin | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Glyn Linton | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.53k | £4.04k | £7.02k | £5.23k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £20 | £20 | £375 | £22.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 08 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 3 NOVEMBER 2007 as amended on 03 Aug 2021 as amended on 03 Feb 2024 as amended on 11 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS PARTICIPATING IN MUSIC GROUPS ORGANISED BY THE GWENT MUSIC SUPPORT SERVICE (GMSS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NEWPORT (CITY OF NEWPORT), TORFAEN, MONMOUTHSHIRE, BLAENAU GWENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 The Nurseries
Langstone
Newport
NP18 2NT
- Phone:
- 07708 113293
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window