WORCESTER COMMUNITY HOUSING LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worcester Community Housing Limited is a registered provider of housing run on a not-for-profit basis. The principal activities of the Company are the provision of social housing: the letting, management and maintenance of affordable homes for people in housing need together with appropriate support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income:
£26,722,474
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £26.72m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£18,170,093
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £18.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £301,298 from government contract(s) and £2,917,000 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.17m | |
Retained for future use | £8.55m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 June 2005: Standard registration
- 24 October 2016: Removed (Exempt charity)
- WCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.99m | £19.66m | £23.14m | £24.47m | £26.72m | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.75m | £16.68m | £18.27m | £18.27m | £18.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £301.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.92m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.99m | £19.66m | £23.14m | £24.47m | £26.72m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £17.75m | £16.68m | £18.27m | £18.27m | £18.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.79m | £58.84m | £65.09m | £184.36m | £210.03m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.44m | £4.30m | £4.32m | £5.42m | £30.65m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.35m | -£3.24m | -£4.66m | -£2.96m | -£5.78m | |
|
Total liabilities | £33.98m | £35.56m | £36.78m | £48.41m | £85.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 30 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 05 FEBRUARY 2004, 05 NOVEMBER 2003, 07 APRIL 2005 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO: 1) PROVIDE HOUSES HOSTELS ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE AND ANY ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WITH CONSIDERATION TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF (I) HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND (II) SERVICES, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE EACH TOGETHER WITH ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE COMMUNITY; 4)PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; B) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; D) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME. 5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTIVE THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A SOCIAL LANDLORD REGISTERED AS SUCH WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION EXPRESSLY PERMITTED PURSUANT TO SECTION 2 OF THE HOUSING ACT 1996.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window