Governing document WORCESTER COMMUNITY HOUSING LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 05 FEBRUARY 2004, 05 NOVEMBER 2003, 07 APRIL 2005 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO: 1) PROVIDE HOUSES HOSTELS ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE AND ANY ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WITH CONSIDERATION TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF (I) HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND (II) SERVICES, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE EACH TOGETHER WITH ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE COMMUNITY; 4)PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; B) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; D) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME. 5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTIVE THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A SOCIAL LANDLORD REGISTERED AS SUCH WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION EXPRESSLY PERMITTED PURSUANT TO SECTION 2 OF THE HOUSING ACT 1996.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.