EVERLASTING LIFE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD. MINISTERING TO THE NEEDY THROUGH PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD AND COUNSELLING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KINGSLEY KWABENA AMOAH | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET AFFUM-BAIDOO | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ARHIN | Trustee | 27 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHMOND ITUZARO | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ISAAC KINGSLEY MENSAH | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SERWA AMOAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.15k | £61.80k | £57.71k | £53.34k | £67.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.95k | £54.11k | £51.81k | £44.27k | £52.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS ATTACHED TO THE DOCUMENT HERETO. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. 3) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH. 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 5) REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS, DRUG AND ALCOHOL ABUSERS. 6) TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PERSONS WHO NEED THOSE FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Everlasting Life Int. Ministries
1 CANDLE GROVE
PECKHAM
LONDON
SE15 3JP
- Phone:
- 07508000001
- Email:
- info@everlastinglife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window