PHILIP AND JUDITH GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and support the development of pupils in underprivileged communities both in the UK and abroad. To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public by supporting missionaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Reading
- Germany
- South Africa
Governance
- 09 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP NEVILL GREEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANNE GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £375.00k | £68.12k | £68.54k | £100.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.19k | £374.82k | £127.52k | £109.11k | £96.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 5TH MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUPILS IN UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES BOTH OVERSEAS AND IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION; II) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUPPORTING MISSIONARIES AND TO INCLUDE THE UPKEEP AND PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP BOTH OVERSEAS AND IN THE UK.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS AND IN THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIXON WILSON
CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
22 CHANCERY LANE
LONDON
WC2A 1LS
- Phone:
- 01189845935
- Email:
- philipngreen@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window