SHEFFIELD ISLAMIC CENTRE MADINA MASJID TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The chairty activites at present are as follows - (1) provide and maintain a school for general Islamic educaution of children; (2) facilities for eduaction of adults; (3) facilities and services for congregational prayers for men, women and children and; (3) developing social and welfare service for the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 21 June 2005: Standard registration
- SIC MADINA MASJID (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD ISLAMIC CENTRE MEDINA MASJID TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED YAQUB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SABIR HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
QURBAN HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAJI MOHAMMAD NAZIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.10k | £148.85k | £222.06k | £161.66k | £214.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.89k | £115.86k | £148.21k | £155.19k | £184.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 November 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 December 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 December 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1) TO PROMOTE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE HANFIA (BRALVIA) SCHOOL OF THOUGH; AND 3.2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, AGE AND ILLNESS AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH SHEFFIELD (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") (AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF THE MUSLIM FAITH OR WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH SHEFFIELD, SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Wolseley Road
SHEFFIELD
S8 0ZU
- Phone:
- 01142585021
- Email:
- admin@madinamasjid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window