THE CLARKE FOLEY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide at the Centre facilities for recreation, education or other leisure time occupations in the interests of social welfare for residents over the age of 50 years of Ilkley, Addingham, Burley in Wharfedale, Menston and surrounding districts within the Metropolitan District of Bradford without distinction of creed or colour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 23 May 2005: Standard registration
- THE JAMES CLARKE AND SARAH FOLEY TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART KENNETH HYDE | Chair | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Harris | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Spence | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WHITEMORE | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jayne Lynam | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jill Kathryn Finnerty | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.52k | £179.21k | £164.92k | £276.77k | £316.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.90k | £217.09k | £217.31k | £325.02k | £367.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.11k | £103.51k | £24.35k | N/A | £200 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
(A) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE (IN CO-OPERATION WITH VOLUNTARY BODIES) A CENTRE IN ILKLEY FORMERLY MANAGED BY THE JAMES CLARKE AND SARAH FOLEY TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY (AND MORE RECENTLY KNOWN AS THE CLARKE FOLEY CENTRE) SITUATED IN CUNLIFFE ROAD ILKLEY LS29 9DZ AND PROVIDE AT THE CENTRE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION, OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RESIDENTS, OVER THE AGE OF 50 YEARS, OF ILKLEY, ADDINGHAM, BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE, MENSTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF CREED OR COLOUR AND (B) TO PROVIDE A FOCAL POINT FOR VOLUNTARY EFFORT GIVEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO MAY BE DISADVANTAGED (D) NOTHING IN CLAUSES (A) TO (C) ABOVE INCLUSIVE SHALL AUTHORISE ANY NON-CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSE
Area of benefit
ILKLEY, ADDINGHAM, BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE, MENSTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Clarke Foley Centre
Cunliffe Road
ILKLEY
LS29 9DZ
- Phone:
- 01943607016
- Email:
- admin@clarkefoley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window