Financial history GORSELAND SCHOOL PFA

Charity number: 1109654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £13.83k £5.88k £1.49k £14.85k £7.11k
Total expenditure £11.13k £13.22k £148 £11.15k £5.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A