THE REGIONAL REFUGEE FORUM NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We empower Refugee and Asylum Seeker community activists and mobilisers to turn their ideas to support their communities into practical action. And we unite the region's Refugee led Community Organisations (RCOs) in collective action to produce their Collective Voice so it can influence the development of evidence based policy and practice around Asylum, Integration and Equality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £6,450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Darlington
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 02 June 2005: Standard registration
- RRF NE (Working name)
- THE FORUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramatoulie BJ Saidykhan | Chair | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Riada Kullani | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samsoudini Moussa | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ali Abdullah | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asadollah Ibrahimi | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nida Muzaffar | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Nishanthini Mayurathan | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Mupaya Masuku | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.93k | £169.57k | £114.43k | £57.83k | £74.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.74k | £143.50k | £130.51k | £99.70k | £96.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.18k | £7.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.05k | N/A | £6.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONGST ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND AND TO THAT END TO PROVIDE A MECHANISM FOR HEARING THE VOICE OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES BY BRINGING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF REFUGEE COMMUNITIES WORKING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND (TYNE & WEAR, TEES VALLEY, NORTHUMBERLAND AND COUNTY DURHAM).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadcasting House
2nd Floor
Vanguard Suite
Gilkes Street
Middlesbrough
- Phone:
- 07407804539
- Email:
- info@refugeevoices.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window