Financial history THE BIRCHALL TRUST

Charity number: 1109637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £330.58k £410.73k £523.05k £512.92k £854.25k
Total expenditure £333.32k £369.61k £394.35k £513.30k £778.06k
Income from government contracts £83.79k £57.53k £139.56k £142.35k £440.38k
Income from government grants N/A £57.53k N/A £15.97k £16.22k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £34.96k £39.01k £25.67k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £100 £118 £73.67k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £487.76k £466.42k £743.01k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £232 £4.38k £11.89k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £3.01k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £291.04k £389.05k £624.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £30.36k £31.43k £36.32k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.89k £2.36k £2.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £72.95k £92.82k £117.52k