THE BIRCHALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We empower people (adults and children/young people) affected by rape, sexual abuse, or sexualised violence to recover from their trauma so they can lead safe and fulfilling lives. We cover issues including childhood abuse, child sexual exploitation, trafficking, sex workers and online abuse. We offer face to face and online counselling, play therapy, pre-trial therapy, education & peer support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£854,247
Donations and legacies | £25.67k | |
Charitable activities | £743.01k | |
Other trading activities | £73.67k | |
Investments | £11.89k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£778,059
Raising funds | £36.32k | |
Charitable activities | £624.22k | |
Other | £117.52k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £440,383 from 7 government contract(s) and £16,216 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £153.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £624.22k | |
Retained for future use | £76.19k |
People

22 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 May 2005: Standard registration
- SOUTH CUMBRIA RAPE AND ABUSE SERVICE (Previous name)
- SOUTH CUMBRIA RAPE AND ABUSE SERVICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paula Cook | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine McIntyre | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Rebecca Brown | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HANSON | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.58k | £410.73k | £523.05k | £512.92k | £854.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £333.32k | £369.61k | £394.35k | £513.30k | £778.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £83.79k | £57.53k | £139.56k | £142.35k | £440.38k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.53k | N/A | £15.97k | £16.22k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £34.96k | £39.01k | £25.67k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £100 | £118 | £73.67k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £487.76k | £466.42k | £743.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £232 | £4.38k | £11.89k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £3.01k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £291.04k | £389.05k | £624.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £30.36k | £31.43k | £36.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £7.89k | £2.36k | £2.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £72.95k | £92.82k | £117.52k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £9.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £445.00k | £444.63k | £513.54k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £2.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 DEC 2011 as amended on 04 Oct 2022 as amended on 02 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF RAPE, SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST BY THE PROMOTION OF A SERVICE WHICH OFFERS SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING IN THE SOUTH CUMBRIA AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND TO WORK TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT SEXUAL CRIMES AND THE EFFECT ON THE VICTIMS OF SUCH CRIMES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. TO OFFER THE SERVICE TO PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND PARTNERS, WHO MAY ALSO NEED SUPPORT, COUNSELLING OR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTH CUMBRIA AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 HARTINGTON STREET
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
CUMBRIA
LA14 5SR
- Phone:
- 01229820828
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window