Governing document THE BIRCHALL TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 DEC 2011 as amended on 04 Oct 2022 as amended on 02 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF RAPE, SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST BY THE PROMOTION OF A SERVICE WHICH OFFERS SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING IN THE SOUTH CUMBRIA AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND TO WORK TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT SEXUAL CRIMES AND THE EFFECT ON THE VICTIMS OF SUCH CRIMES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. TO OFFER THE SERVICE TO PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND PARTNERS, WHO MAY ALSO NEED SUPPORT, COUNSELLING OR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTH CUMBRIA AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.