Financial history DOTS 'N' SPOTS DAY NURSERY AND OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1110557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £459.09k £400.68k £420.87k £425.20k £538.14k
Total expenditure £491.79k £414.85k £433.50k £436.40k £490.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £46.31k £2.70k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £537.47k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £668
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £490.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £29.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0