Trustees DOTS 'N' SPOTS DAY NURSERY AND OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1110557

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Wardell Wardell | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Rose | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Perriman | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marie Tasker | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Bland | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.