Financial history HOME-START SOUTH DERBYSHIRE

Charity number: 1109687
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £53.17k £30.71k £41.59k £41.37k £62.23k
Total expenditure £74.81k £75.12k £67.39k £63.01k £32.47k
Income from government contracts N/A £11.76k £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.09k £17.37k £12.62k £12.75k