MTC CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to establish a trust fund for general charitable purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 August 2005: Standard registration
- 30 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE TINA AND MICHAEL COLE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £1.00k | £35.85k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.95k | £1.31k | £17.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION, INSTITUTIONS, PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES LAID DOWN BY THE OFFICE OF THE CHIEF RABBI OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES BETWEEN THEM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window