AYTON VICTORY PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide sporting and recreational facilities for the Parishes of East and West Ayton, we maintain two play areas, as well as sports pitches for both cricket and football. All of our facilities are covered by CCTV for both security and safety of all users. Funding is raised through sponsorship, grants from our Parish Councils and Local Authorities, as well as local fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 May 2005: Standard registration
- EAST AND WEST AYTON VICTORY PLAYING FIELD (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS CALVERT | Chair | 02 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Boyle | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Collins | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Flinton | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ALMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL STANLEY COOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR FRANK WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER FRANCIS SUGGITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/12/2020 | 08/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £987 | £1.42k | £2.30k | £936 | £938 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.92k | £4.95k | £1.42k | £1.35k | £648 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 4 JULY 1952
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A PUBLIC PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND AND FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF SPORTS RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENT OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST AYTON AND THEIR IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THESE PRESENTSS
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST AYTON AND THEIR IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HALL GARTH LANE
WEST AYTON
SCARBOROUGH
YO13 9JA
- Phone:
- 01723865787
- Email:
- almond2303@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window