BRIGHTON FESTIVAL OF WORLD SACRED MUSIC LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity stages events, including a festival of world sacred music and educational workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 August 2005: Standard registration
- 23 October 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BFWSM (Working name)
- WORLD SACRED MUSIC (Working name)
- WORLD SACRED MUSIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
- WSM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.11k | £57.00k | £34.21k | £21.97k | £14.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.09k | £57.24k | £35.28k | £21.83k | £13.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 14 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 16 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 16 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 14 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BRIGHTON & HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF VARIOUS RELIGIOUS FAITHS AND TRADITIONS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH REGULAR FESTIVALS OF WORLD SACRED MUSIC, INCLUDING EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON & HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window