MALAWI ORPHAN FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Malawi Orphan Fund primarily raises funds in the UK to support the work of Mchinji Children's Home in Malawi, also known as the Home of Hope, Malawi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Malawi
Governance
- 29 July 2005: Standard registration
- HOME OF HOPE (Working name)
- Mchinji Children’s Fund (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Gregory Mnatzaganian | Chair | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ruth Lindley | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mary Priddin | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Janes | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zannah Lindley | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Lambert-Mason | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.66k | £80.61k | £62.57k | £89.57k | £109.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.18k | £92.41k | £52.29k | £80.11k | £113.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN IN THE CARE OF MCHINJI MISSION ORPHANAGE AND OTHER CHRISTIAN-BASED ORPHAN CARE PROJECTS IN MALAWI; AND B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF ORPHANS IN MALAWI.
Area of benefit
MALAWI, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 TAMWORTH ROAD
BEDFORD
MK41 8QY
- Phone:
- 079720403133
- Email:
- info@malawiorphanfund.uk
- Website:
-
malawiorphanfund.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window