REGIS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides religeous activities for all age groups. Prayer meetings, teaching, tea and coffe for local people. Teaching courses on the bible. Sunday School and youth work. Outreach to the community with both spiritual and practical help. We support oversees missions to the young people of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sandwell
- Kenya
Governance
- 31 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Anne Marsh | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY PAUL COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.76k | £72.00k | £79.00k | £64.00k | £61.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.02k | £58.00k | £56.00k | £45.00k | £51.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN ROWLEY REGIS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
ROWLEY REGIS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 UPLANDS AVENUE
ROWLEY REGIS
B65 9PT
- Phone:
- 07747622425
- Email:
- timc.coleman@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window