THE FORESTERS HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foresters Heritage Trust was been set up to formally open a museum and maintain the history of the Ancient Order of Foresters Friendly Society Limited which was founded in 1834. In addition it provides an archive service to academics and members of the public researching social history and/or investigating family backgrounds. This service responds to enquiries received from around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Charlton-Hubble | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robert Edward Lewis | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Mrs CP Eagleson | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|||||
KG CARPENTER | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS J POOLEY | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR AJ POOLEY | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM JOHN PRECHNER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.43k | £40.66k | £58.13k | £46.66k | £99.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.60k | £33.42k | £32.08k | £34.56k | £43.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST PROPERTY AND APPLY IT TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND BACKGROUND OF THE FRIENDLY SOCIETY MOVEMENT IN GREAT BRITAIN ( IN PARTICULAR THAT OF THE ANCIENT ORDER OF FORESTERS FRIENDLY SOCIETY) BY THE COLLECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF RELEVANT MATERIALS, ARTEFACTS AND PUBLICATIONS, AND TO MAKE SUCH MATERIALS, ARTEFACTS AND PUBLICATIONS FREELY AVAILABLE FOR PUBLIC INSPECTION.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CORNSLAND
BRENTWOOD
CM14 4HP
- Phone:
- 01277222028
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window