PENNY BEALE MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect the physical and mental health of persons who are or have been victims of domestic violence and to advance the education of the public, including local authorities and voluntary bodies, by the provision of information, advice and training programmes into the causes, remedies and prevention of domestic violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 July 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PENNY BEALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
EMMA MARY ALEXENDRA COCHRANE | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE BERTHE DEUNETTE | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jane Warrington | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN ANN COOPER BA JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £554 | £144 | £171 | £9.02k | £351 | |
|
Total expenditure | £354 | £1.02k | £384 | £569 | £5.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25TH NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED ON 25TH JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY BODIES, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES INTO THE CAUSES, REMEDIES AND PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 CROFT ROAD
HASTINGS
TN34 3HE
- Phone:
- 01424436269
- Email:
- PENNY.BEALE@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window