ASSOCIATION OF SENIOR MUSLIM CITIZENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Continue and consolidate efforts towards relief of poverty, improving quality of life of the elderly residents by (1) Home/social and hospital visits together with liaison with their families while in hospital. (2) Organising seminars/talks, presentation, social get together and minimise isolation with emphasis on health and safety. (3) Ensuring improvement in health awareness, safety, reducing is
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
Governance
- 28 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
A SALEEM AKHTAR | Trustee | 28 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Qureshi | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Syed Shahid Alo | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Syed Sarwar Hasan | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SAIFULLAH KHALID | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ASAD OMAR CLLR | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
AZMAT ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
UMMATUL RASOOL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL HAMID SHEIKH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.57k | £2.86k | £2.72k | £126 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £2.46k | £1.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2022 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2022 | 685 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 2005 AND 3 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION SHALL ENDEAVOUR FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE ELDERLY MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY LIVING IN AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ADVICE, INFORMATION, ADVOCACY AND REPRESENTATION SERVICES ON MATTERS SUCH AS WELFARE, HOUSING, MONEY MATTERS, RACIAL EQUALITY, HEALTH, EDUCATION, HOME SUPPORT, INTERPRETING SERVICES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT IMPACT ON THEIR LIVES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE
Area of benefit
HARROW, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Hawthorn Drive
HARROW
Middlesex
HA2 7NX
- Phone:
- 07942820847
- Email:
- Asadomar2020@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window