GUYHEALTH (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the preservation and protection of good health among the inhabitants of Guyana.The provision of assistance with nedical equipment, supplies and personnel. To advance the education of Guyanese in th efield of helath in Guyana and the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Guyana
Governance
- 19 October 2005: Standard registration
- GUYANA HEALTHCARE CO-ORDINATING GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER RAMRAYKA MBA | Chair |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6TH SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
I) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF GUYANA (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE WITH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, SUPPLIES, PERSONNEL OR FACILITIES. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF GUYANESE ORIGIN WHO ARE STUDYING OR TRAINING IN MEDICINE OR HEALTHCARE IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL SUPPORT THROUGHOUT THE PERIOD OF THEIR STUDIES.
Area of benefit
GUYANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 MORDEN HILL
LONDON
SE13 7NP
- Phone:
- 02086924708
- Email:
- pramrayka@compuserve.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window