COMMUNITY TRANSPORT GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of community transport provision for residents of gloucestershire where there is a lack of availability or unable to use public transport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Currie | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MELODIE PRITCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £113 | £109 | £10 | £60 | £25 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 428 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
CHARITYS OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT PROVISION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS, OR POVERTY OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES. ''COMMUNITY TRANSPORT'' SHALL MEAN THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT AT LOW COST OR NO COST TO PERSONS IN NEED WITH A VIEW TO MINIMISING SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dial A Ride
Hams Road
LYDNEY
GL15 5PE
- Phone:
- 01594843809
- Email:
- louise@lydneydialaride.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window