Financial history POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (LEICESTER)

Charity number: 1109790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £114.86k £96.97k £107.63k £136.63k £143.13k
Total expenditure £115.91k £96.29k £106.66k £132.28k £145.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A