Accounts and annual returns LINCOLN STUDENT SOLUTIONS LIMITED

Charity number: 1110509
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 15 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 15 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2011 25 October 2012 102 days late
Annual return 15 September 2010 08 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2010 08 April 2011 On Time