STANBRIDGE AND TILSWORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a Community Hall for as many users and activities as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 02 June 2005: Standard registration
- STANBRIDGE & TILSWORTH VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Waters | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neville Lidford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT PETER VENN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.02k | £35.17k | £19.04k | £56.78k | £31.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.45k | £60.56k | £18.27k | £35.56k | £38.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.14k | £19.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2005 AND 8 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF STANBRIDGE & TILSWORTH IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORDSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL, RECREATION GROUND, SPORTS AND RECREATION FACILITIES, FOR THE USE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF STANBRIDGE & TILSWORTH, BEDFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Tilsworth Road
Stanbridge
Leighton Buzzard
LU7 9HY
- Phone:
- 07988 827601
- Email:
- bookings@sandtca.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window