THE GRAND AT CLITHEROE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity of The Grand is to support young people and the broader local community in terms of personal development in the media, music, arts, and performance fields. In addition The Grand is raising awareness and support for its own Solomon Project which aims to provide relief to suffering and poverty and also improve education of children in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 31 August 2005: Standard registration
- TGAC (Working name)
- THE GRAND AT CLITHEROE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN EDWARD LANCASTER MBE DR | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEVEN JOHN LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNA CATHERINE LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY LANCASTER MBE MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £922.07k | £778.59k | £352.85k | £479.99k | £381.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £970.63k | £928.61k | £451.79k | £615.30k | £671.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £478.44k | £500.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £431.59k | £267.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £542 | £395 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £11.49k | £10.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £389.21k | £386.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £581.42k | £541.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.56k | £30.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 May 2024 | 307 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH, SUPPORT AND OPERATE A COMMUNITY, MULTIMEDIA, MUSIC AND ARTS VENUE AND SKATE PARK IN THE TOWN OF CLITHEROE, LANCASHIRE AND TO PROMOTE ITS USE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CLITHEROE AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, THROUGH OUTREACH ACTIVITY AND MINISTRY, UPHOLDING CHRISTIAN ETHOS AND VALUES.
Area of benefit
CLITHEROE, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 YORK STREET
CLITHEROE
LANCASHIRE
BB7 2DL
- Phone:
- 01200421599
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
thegrandvenue.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window