Financial history THE LENTON CENTRE

Charity Number: 1109847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £254.79k £491.73k £323.75k £313.64k £309.48k
Total expenditure £237.16k £229.08k £418.99k £422.92k £398.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.86k
Income from government grants £5.42k £77.10k £12.00k £7.00k £13.90k