Financial history FRANK WICKHAM HALL

Charity number: 1111226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.00k £34.23k £32.95k £22.41k £25.54k
Total expenditure £14.67k £27.06k £28.90k £25.04k £30.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £19.67k £14.36k £270 N/A