THE ANIMAL HOUSE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to rehome injured abused and homeless animals, to have any necessary veterinary treatment carried out including speying and neutering, to raise funds via collections and donations and to educate the public on animal care and welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 2005: Standard registration
- TAH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Broom | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
CARYS LAURA FRIAR | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LIN REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN BUZZARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAYNE TRACEY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DAVID REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.00k | £146.97k | £143.15k | £201.89k | £174.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.00k | £124.18k | £150.31k | £195.48k | £166.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 21 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERRING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
POSTAL ADDRESS ONLY
4 Kintore Croft
Birmingham
West Midlands
B32 4JJ
- Phone:
- 00000000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window