HEDLEY HALL TRAINING

Charity number: 1109910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education, in particular of adults, including the teaching of literacy, numeracy and communication.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,107
Total expenditure: £22,154

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 June 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edwin Ascott Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
JEFFREY DAVID INWOOD Trustee
None on record
KATE BRUCE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.10k £13.46k £13.46k £15.13k £8.11k
Total expenditure £17.59k £11.25k £11.25k £18.28k £22.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 March 2024 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 February 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HEDLEY HALL TRAINING
HEDLEY HALL
DENMARK ROAD
BATH
BA2 3RE
Phone:
01225444147