Financial history MIDASPLUS

Charity number: 1110699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.93k £24.97k £14.42k £13.35k £21.31k
Total expenditure £14.91k £16.50k £9.85k £15.26k £17.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A