CHAIRS AND SPARES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chairs and Spares is a social business bringing together representatives of a number of organisations to make available through reuse/recycling items that will be of benefit to those on low income, create opportunities for training and enterprise and enhance peoples quality of life, self worth and employability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 12 August 2005: Standard registration
- 26 August 2016: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.35k | £152.51k | £116.56k | £87.79k | £89.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.39k | £142.35k | £112.81k | £114.09k | £111.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 26 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 15 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 17 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROTECT OR PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- (A) BY HELPING TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF BOTH INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF ESSENTIAL HOUSEHOLD EQUIPMENT AS IDENTIFIED TO THE CHARITY BY STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES THROUGH COLLECTING DONATED FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD EQUIPMENT AND STORING AND CHECKING ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES FOR SAFETY BEFORE DELIVERING TO THOSE IN NEED. (B) BY RECYCLING, RE-USING RENOVATING AND REPAIRING HOUSEHOLD ITEMS THAT WOULD OTHERWISE HAVE TO BE DISPOSED OF AS LANDFILL. (C) BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE UNEMPLOYED, THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THOSE ON COMMUNITY SERVICE OR SIMILAR ORDERS, TO PRACTISE AND ACQUIRE SKILLS AND GAIN CONFIDENCE WHILST CONTRIBUTING TO THE WELFARE OF THEIR OWN COMMUNITIES. (D) THROUGH ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF RECYCLING, RE-USE OF WASTE MANAGEMENT AND TO PROMULGATE THE VALUE OF SUSTAINABLE LIFESTYLES. (E) THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF VOLUNTEER TRAINING SCHEMES TO UNDERTAKE THE REPAIR AND/OR RESTORATION OF DONATED ITEMS OR ANY OTHER ASPECTS OF THE CHARITY'S WORK AS APPROPRIATE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. IT IS A DYNAMIC PROCESS WHICH ENABLES ALL PEOPLE TO REALISE THEIR POTENTIAL, AND TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, IN WAYS WHICH SIMULTANEOUSLY PROTECT AND ENHANCE THE EARTH'S LIFE SUPPORT SYSTEMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, TELFORD AND WREKIN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window