LANKA CARE-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To initiate Poverty Alleviation Either generally or individually, of people living in Sri Lanka. To Advance the Education (Secondary School) in Rural areas of Sri Lanka The relief of unemployment for the public benefit in suchways as may be thought fit, including assistance to find employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 06 July 2005: Standard registration
- LANKA CARE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swarna Rathnapali Gunaratne | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chathura Jayawardena | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anderson Ediri Wickramasuriya | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
GANESHAMOORTHY SOMASUNTHARAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIHAL VINCENT GOONETJLLEKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PADMA KUSUMALATHA PATHIRANAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROHAN PRIYADARSHA JAYASENA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDYA THARINDRA EDIRISINGHE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.80k | £9.80k | £950 | £10.00k | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £9.75k | £900 | £9.50k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
(A) TO INITIATE POVERTY ALLEVIATION EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN SRI LANKA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN ALL THE DISTRICTS EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS STUDYING IN SECONDARY SCHOOLS IN RURAL AREAS OF SRI LANKA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES [ NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITIES] FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS. (C) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 604
68 BELSIZE PARK
LONDON
NW3 4EH
- Phone:
- 02075867773
- Email:
- samatasetha@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window