VITAL REGENERATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vital Regeneration is an agency working for positive change in London's most deprived neighbourhoods. Our mission is to design and deliver innovative, sustainable programmes that enable individuals and communities to fulfil their potential through learning, employment and enterprise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £305,135 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 August 2005: Standard registration
- 04 December 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1166311 THAMES REACH CHARITY
- VR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49m | £1.39m | £1.24m | £876.09k | £452.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £1.27m | £1.04m | £646.13k | £287.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £507.09k | £687.40k | £305.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £110.47k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £200.35k | £180.00k | £183.90k | £124.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £55.03k | £63.03k | £0 | £64.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.24m | £1.14m | £990.05k | £687.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £68.01k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.48m | £1.10m | £882.43k | £612.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £58.15k | £41.99k | £31.26k | £31.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 April 2019 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 April 2019 | 64 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 26 March 2019 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 26 March 2019 | 511 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 12 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE , AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II)TO EXISTING BUSINESS; 3.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDING, AND /OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.6 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.7 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.1.8 THE PROTECTION OF CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 3.1.9 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 3.1.10 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; 3.1.11 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS. 3.4 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 3.5 TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LEISURE TIME (INCLUDING PHYSICAL AND EDUCATIONAL) ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 3.6 TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 3.7 THE PROMOTION PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window