SHOTWICK LAKE SAILING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SAILING AND ASSOCIATED WATERSPORTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
- Wirral
- Wrexham
Governance
- 16 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Guy | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Leslie Thomas Perry | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Paul Cooper | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR RON KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.99k | £22.45k | £26.79k | £24.42k | £27.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.26k | £16.36k | £24.78k | £24.04k | £25.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.10k | £550 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING AND ASSOCIATED WATER SPORTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, FLINTSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Sandy Lane
Saltney
CHESTER
CH4 8UA
- Phone:
- 01244 280822
- Email:
- training@shotwicksailing.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window