CHILDREN OF AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting a Children's Home for children orphaned through HIV/AIDS Supporting a Creche / Nursery for children affected by HIV/AIDS and poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Botswana
- Eswatini
- Lesotho
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 21 July 2005: Standard registration
- COFA (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIEZL HESKETH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LAURA LISA BOUCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY PAUL HERMOLLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11k | £1.81k | £1.78k | £4.50k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £3.44k | £1.00k | £4.34k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 19 JUNE 2005 as amended on 27 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG ORPHANED CHILDREN IN SOUTHERN AFRICA SUFFERING FROM OR ORPHANED AS A RESULT OF HIV/AIDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION WITHIN SOUTHERN AFRICA, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR THEIR ACCOMMODATION, TREATMENT AND CARE. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN SOUTHERN AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN MEETING THE COST OF PROGRESSING TO HIGHER EDUCATION, INCLUDING SCHOOL FEES, UNIFORMS, TRANSPORT COSTS AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS IS DEEMED NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
KWAZULU-NATAL AREA OF SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Beech Wood
Cavendish Road
Bowdon
Altrincham
WA14 2NH
- Phone:
- 07974161027
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window